WebbRichard Alsop Wise (September 2, 1843 – December 21, 1900) was an educator and politician from Virginia. He was a U.S. Representative for parts of two terms. He was a son of Henry Alexander Wise, grandson of John Sergeant, brother of John Sergeant Wise, and cousin of George Douglas Wise, all U.S. Representatives. WebbBiography. SERGEANT, JOHN, (son of Jonathan Dickinson Sergeant, grandfather of John Sergeant Wise and Richard Alsop Wise, and great-grandfather of John Crain Kunkel), a Representative from Pennsylvania; born in Philadelphia, Pa., December 5, 1779; attended the common schools and the University of Pennsylvania at Philadelphia; was graduated …
Richard Alsop Shearman & Sterling
WebbWISE, Henry Alexander, (father of John Sergeant Wise and Richard Alsop Wise and uncle of George Douglas Wise), a Representative from Virginia; born in Drummondtown, Accomack County, Va., December 3, 1806; was privately tutored until his twelfth year and then entered Margaret Academy, near Pungoteague, Accomack County; was graduated from … WebbHenry Alexander Wise (3 December 1806-12 September 1876) was a member of the US House of Representatives (W-VA 8) from 4 March 1833 to 3 March 1843 (succeeding Richard Coke Jr. and preceding Willoughby Newton) and from VA-7 from 4 March 1843 to 12 February 1844 (succeeding William L. Goggin and preceding Thomas H. Bayly), and … etwatwa ext3 secondary
Richard Alsop Wise - hmong.es
WebbRichard Alsop Wise (2 de septiembre de 1843-21 de diciembre de 1900) fue un educador y político de Virginia . Fue representante de Estados Unidos durante partes de dos mandatos. Era hijo de Henry Alexander Wise , nieto de John Sergeant , hermano de John Sergeant Wise y primo de George Douglas Wise , todos representantes de Estados Unidos. Richard Alsop Wise (* 2. September 1843 in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania; † 21. Dezember 1900 in Williamsburg, Virginia) war ein US-amerikanischer Politiker. Zwischen 1898 und 1900 vertrat er zweimal den Bundesstaat Virginia im US-Repräsentantenhaus. WebbHe served as captain in the Confederate States Army during the Civil War. He was Commonwealth"s attorney of the city of Richmond from 1870 to 1889, when he resigned. Wise was elected as a Democrat to the Forty-seventh and to the three succeeding Congresses (March 4, 1881 – March 3, 1889). etwatch cloud